EP3269557 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND VERIFYING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niedermeier, Klaus Lärchenstr. 9 94339 Leiblfing / DE | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reithmeier, Sieglinde Lärchenstrasse 9 94339 Leiblfing / DE | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Naessens, Stephan Patentanwaltskanzlei Stephan Naessens Nonntal 17 83471 Berchtesgaden / DE | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16179118.1 | 12.07.2016 | [2018/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269557 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3269557 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/305, G09F3/00, B42D25/36 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
B42D25/305 (EP);
B42D25/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN UND VERIFIZIEREN EINES GEGENSTANDES | [2018/03] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AND VERIFYING AN OBJECT | [2018/03] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION ET DE VERIFICATION D'UN OBJET | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2016 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU488652B (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG) [X] 1,14* figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2005080088 (TULLIS RUSSEL PAPERMAKERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,6-9,12,13,15 * figure 1 * [Y] 2-5,10,11; | [Y]EP2060407 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2010044438 (CHEN YUQUN [US], et al) [Y] 2-5 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102012201016 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0023] *; | [X]DE102014207323 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-9,13,15 * figures 1,2 * |