EP3269812 - CELL-FREE ULTRA-HIGH THROUGHPUT SAMPLING SYSTEMS FOR PROTEIN ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinisch-Westfälische Technische Hochschule Aachen (RWTH) Templergraben 55 52062 Aachen / DE | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwaneberg, Ulrich Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Vojcic, Ljubica Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Körfer, Georgette Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Pitzler, Christian Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 05 /
Mertens, Alan Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | 06 /
Martinez-Moya, Ronny Worringer Weg 3 52074 Aachen / DE | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16179234.6 | 13.07.2016 | [2018/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269812 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/1034 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLFREIE ULTRA-HOCHDURCHSATZ-DURCHMUSTERUNGSSYSTEME FÜR DAS PROTEIN-ENGINEERING | [2018/03] | English: | CELL-FREE ULTRA-HIGH THROUGHPUT SAMPLING SYSTEMS FOR PROTEIN ENGINEERING | [2018/03] | French: | SYSTEMES DE SELECTION A ULTRA-HAUT DEBIT EXEMPTS DE CELLULE POUR L'INGENIERIE DES PROTEINES | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - SYLVIA MAY ET AL, "In Vitro Expressed GPCR Inserted in Polymersome Membranes for Ligand-Binding Studies", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (20121119), vol. 52, no. 2, doi:10.1002/anie.201204645, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 749 - 753, XP055271230 [X] 12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201204645 | [ ] - May S, "Functional characterisation of in vitro synthesised G-protein coupled receptors in polymersomes", (20120702), Dissertation, URL: http://ubm.opus.hbz-nrw.de/volltexte/2012/3184/pdf/doc.pdf, (20161213), XP055328492 [ ] * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere "Materials and Methods" und "Results and Discussion) * | [XY] - Madhavan Nallani ET AL, "Proteopolymersomes: in vitro production of a membrane protein in polymersome membranes", Biointerphases, United States, doi:10.1116/1.3644384], (20111201), page 153, URL: http://download.springer.com/static/pdf/195/art%3A10.1116%2F1.3644384.pdf?originUrl=http://link.springer.com/article/10.1116/1.3644384&token2=exp=1455205035~acl=/static/pdf/195/art%253A10.1116%252F1.3644384.pdf?originUrl=http%3A%2F%2Flink.springer.com%2Farticle%2F10.1116%2F1.3644384*~hmac=3cc6922ed1, (20160211), XP055249466 [X] 12,13 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Fig. 1 * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.3644384 | [XY] - BALASUBRAMANIAN VIMALKUMAR ET AL, "Multifaceted polymersome platforms: Spanning from self-assembly to drug delivery and protocells", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20160520), vol. 60, doi:10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2016.04.004, ISSN 0079-6700, pages 51 - 85, XP029712061 [X] 12,13 * das ganze Dokument, insbesodere "6.3. Gene and protein expressing protocells" * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2016.04.004 | [Y] - GEORGETTE KÖRFER ET AL, "In vitro flow cytometry-based screening platform for cellulase engineering", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20160517), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/srep26128, page 26128, XP055327597 [Y] 1-13 * das ganze Dokument, insbesondere Abb. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep26128 | [Y] - GEORGETTE WIRTZ ET AL, "Development of a flow cytometer-based in vitro compartmentalization screening platform for directed protein evolution", NEW BIOTECHNOLOGY, NL, (20140701), vol. 31, doi:10.1016/j.nbt.2014.05.1987, ISSN 1871-6784, page S149, XP055327598 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbt.2014.05.1987 | [A] - MALINOVA V ET AL, "Synthetic biology, inspired by synthetic chemistry", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 586, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2012.05.033, ISSN 0014-5793, (20120516), pages 2146 - 2156, (20120612), XP028400692 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2012.05.033 | [A] - PASCAL TANNER ET AL, "Polymeric Vesicles: From Drug Carriers to Nanoreactors and Artificial Organelles", ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH, (20111018), vol. 44, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ar200036k, ISSN 0001-4842, pages 1039 - 1049, XP055201342 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar200036k | [A] - VALERIE TALY ET AL, "Droplets as Microreactors for High-Throughput Biology", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY., DE, (20070212), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1002/cbic.200600425, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 263 - 272, XP055327895 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200600425 | [A] - CHRISTIAN PITZLER ET AL, "A Fluorescent Hydrogel-Based Flow Cytometry High-Throughput Screening Platform for Hydrolytic Enzymes", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY., GB, (20141201), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2014.10.018, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 1733 - 1742, XP055327601 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2014.10.018 | by applicant | - TEE, K. L.; SCHWANEBERG, U., COMBINATORIAL CHEMISTRY & HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING, (2007), vol. 10, no. 3, page 197 | - LEEMHUIS, H.; KELLY, R. M.; DIJKHUIZEN, L., IUBMB LIFE, (2009), vol. 61, no. 3, page 222 | - BARET, J.-C. ET AL., LAB ON A CHIP, (2009), vol. 9, no. 13, page 1850 | - MASTROBATTISTA, E. ET AL., CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 12, no. 12, page 1291 | - MILLER, O. J. ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, no. 7, page 561 | - LIEBL, W. ET AL., APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2014), vol. 98, no. 19, page 8099 | - BLANUSA, M.; SCHENK, A.; SADEGHI, H.; MARIENHAGEN, J.; SCHWANEBERG, U., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 406, no. 2, page 141 |