EP3272901 - DEPOSITION ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIFKA, Herbert c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16179871.5 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272901 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C14/04, C23C16/455 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
C23C14/562 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/042 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/044 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45565 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG | [2018/04] | English: | DEPOSITION ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING | [2018/04] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2744305 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,11,18,19 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111]; figures 4,7,11 * [I] 12-14,16,17; | [Y]US4681780 (KAMMAN DANIEL T [US]) [Y] 1-19 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 25; figures 1,4 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2014130734 (LIM HYUNG-TAG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052]; figure 3 *; | [AD]US2011065282 (YAN MIN [US], et al) [AD] 1,19 * paragraph [0024] *; | [A]EP2441856 (SAMSUNG MOBILE DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,19 * figure 13 * | by applicant | US2011065282 | US650385 | US2584553 | US4403379 |