EP3115087 - SPORT BALL WITH INDENTED CASING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berggren, Scott, Ryan C/O Nike Inc One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
Cohen, Tal C/O Nike Inc One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 03 /
White, Vincent, F. C/O Nike Inc One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005-6453 / US | 04 /
Glahn, Gary, W. C/O Nike Inc One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR Oregon 97005-6453 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Simpson, Kirsty Mairi Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16180101.4 | 30.11.2011 | [2017/02] | Priority number, date | US20100959886 | 03.12.2010 Original published format: US 959886 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3115087 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3115087 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63B41/08, A63B45/00, A63B41/10, B29C65/08, B65B51/22 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A63B41/08 (EP,CN,US);
A63B41/10 (EP,US);
A63B45/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29C65/08 (US);
B65B51/225 (US);
A63B2243/0025 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPORTBALL MIT GEKERBTER HÜLLE | [2017/02] | English: | SPORT BALL WITH INDENTED CASING | [2017/02] | French: | BALLON DE SPORT A ENVELOPPE DENTELEE | [2017/02] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11808021.7 / EP2646121 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2011 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.11.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.11.2011 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3256019 (BARTON MYRON M) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 65 - column 6, line 17; figures 1-27 *; | [A]US3512777 (HENDERSON ROBERT BRUCE) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 40; figure 16 *; | [A]US5931752 (GUENTHER DOUGLAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 26; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US6283881 (FEENEY BRIAN [US]) [A] 1-9* column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 51; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2006046879 (KELLY BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US2009325746 | US2009325745 | US2010240479 |