08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
27.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
19.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
13.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.2018 |
Change - applicant |
|
21.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
21.12.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
07.12.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2018 |
First examination report |
|
04.08.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.08.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
01.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
22.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|