EP3125486 - PAPR REDUCTION OF A SINGLE-CARRIER TRANSMISSION SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAVERSO, Sylvain Thales Communications & Security S.A.S. 4 avenue des Louvresses 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/42] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2017/05] | Priori, Enrico Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble «Visium» 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16180683.1 | 22.07.2016 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | FR20150001596 | 27.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1501596 | [2017/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125486 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3125486 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H04L27/2623 (EP);
H04L27/3411 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PAPR REDUZIERUNG EINES EINZELTRÄGER SENDESIGNAL | [2017/05] | English: | PAPR REDUCTION OF A SINGLE-CARRIER TRANSMISSION SIGNAL | [2017/05] | French: | REDUCTION DU FACTEUR DE CRETE D'UNE VOIE D'EMISSION D'UN SIGNAL MONO-PORTEUSE | [2023/21] |
Former [2017/05] | REDUCTION DU FACTEUR DE CRETE D'UNE VOIE D EMISSION D'UN SIGNAL MONO-PORTEUSE | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 21.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6128350 (SHASTRI ANJALI [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 3 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * * column 4, line 24 - line 31 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 26 ** column 5, line 39 - line 48 *; | [XI] - KOLLAR; VARGA; CZIMER, "Clipping Based Iterative PAPR Reduction Techniques for FBMC", 17TH INTERNATIONAL OFDM WORKSHOP 2012; PROCEEDINS OF, Essen , Germany, (20120829), pages 1 - 7, XP002757900 [X] 1,2,4 * page 1, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph IV * * paragraph [0IVB] * * paragraph [00VI] * * figure 5 * * figure 11 * * table I * [I] 3,5-12 | [I] - JONES D L, "Peak power reduction in OFDM and DMT via active channel modification", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, 1999. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY -THIRD ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON OCT. 24-27, 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), doi:10.1109/ACSSC.1999.831875, ISBN 978-0-7803-5700-6, page 1076, XP032142028 [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1999.831875 | [A] - ZHEN HE, "A Novel PAPR Reduction Scheme in FBMC-OQAM Systems Based on Extend Candidate Transmit Sequences", JOURNAL OF INFORMATION AND COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE, CN, (20150210), vol. 12, no. 3, doi:10.12733/jics20105369, ISSN 1548-7741, pages 915 - 925, XP055274062 [A] 1-12 * page 916, line 13 - line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.12733/jics20105369 | Examination | EP1990964 | - INTEL CORPORATION ET AL, "PAPR-Reduction Performance in SC-FDMA Transmission", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-051151 PAPR-REDUCTION PERFORMANCE IN SC-FDMA TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20051003), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Diego, USA; 20051010 - 20051014, XP050596011 | - KIMURA S ET AL, "PAR reduction for OFDM signals based on deep Clipping", COMMUNICATIONS, CONTROL AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2008. ISCCSP 2008. 3RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080312), ISBN 978-1-4244-1687-5, pages 911 - 916, XP031269197 |