EP3120831 - TOPICAL DELIVERY OF SKIN COMPOSITIONS HAVING LOW PH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRILLOUET, Anne-Sophie 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 02 /
DUFORT, Marisa DeVita 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 03 /
FASSIH, Ali 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 04 /
GARCIA, Devin L. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 05 /
HU, Ya-Ping 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 06 /
LI, Wen-Hwa Ting 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 07 /
PARSA, Ramine 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 08 /
PATURI, Jyotsna 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 09 /
ROSSETTI, Dianne 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 10 /
SUN, Ying 90 Woodview Drive Belle Mead New Jersey 08502 / US | 11 /
WANGARI-TALBOT, Janet 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ New Jersey 08558 / US | 12 /
YATES, Robert Wayne 792 Meadowood Lane Warminster Pennsylvania 18974 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16180841.5 | 22.07.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | US201514806699 | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US201514806699 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120831 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120831 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61Q19/00, A61K8/36, A61K8/365, A61K8/37, A61K8/39 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A61K8/735 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/728 (CN);
A61K45/06 (CN);
A61K47/02 (CN);
A61K47/10 (CN);
A61K47/12 (CN);
A61K47/14 (CN);
A61K47/26 (CN);
A61K47/32 (CN);
A61K47/36 (CN);
A61K47/38 (CN);
A61K8/19 (KR);
A61K8/25 (CN);
A61K8/26 (CN,US);
A61K8/34 (KR);
A61K8/345 (BR,CN,RU,US);
A61K8/36 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/362 (KR);
A61K8/365 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/37 (RU);
A61K8/375 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/4993 (CN);
A61K8/73 (CN);
A61K8/731 (CN);
A61K8/81 (KR);
A61K8/8111 (CN);
A61K8/8152 (CN,US);
A61K8/8158 (CN);
A61K8/8194 (BR);
A61K8/86 (CN);
A61K9/0014 (CN);
A61K9/12 (CN);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,BR,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61Q19/007 (US);
A61Q19/08 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TOPISCHE VERABREICHUNG VON HAUTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGEM PH | [2017/04] | English: | TOPICAL DELIVERY OF SKIN COMPOSITIONS HAVING LOW PH | [2017/04] | French: | ADMINISTRATION TOPIQUE DE COMPOSITIONS CUTANÉES AYANT UN FAIBLE PH | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2016 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | TR | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
TR | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63211210 ; | [XY]JPS63211210 (SUNSTAR INC) [X] 1-6,11,12,15 * abstract * [Y] 1-15; | [X]US2005019282 (RENDON MARTA I [US]) [X] 1-6,11,12,15 * example 1 * * page 1, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO2008031194 (ENHANCE SKIN PRODUCTS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11 * page 5, lines 4-13 * * page 6, lines 5-12 * * example 2 *; | [A]WO2012064766 (ZHANG JIE [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2015126618 (POLLOCK DAVID E [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * page 2, paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraphs 26,27 * * page 3, paragraph 38 * * example 2 *; | [X] - "Mango and Exotic Fruit Ice Tea", GNPD, MINTEL, (201506), Database accession no. 3222675, XP002761337 [X] 1,2 * page 2 * | [X] - "Snail Extract Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (200901), Database accession no. 1034065, XP002761338 [X] 1-6,10 * product description; page 1 * * page 2 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 41, Database accession no. 1988-289034, & JPS63211210 A 19880902 (SUNSTAR KK) [X] 1-6,11,12,15 * abstract * | Examination | WO0215860 | - PAVICIC T ET AL, "Efficacy of cream-based novel formulations of hyaluronic acid of different molecular weights in anti-wrinkle treatment", JOURNAL OF DRUGS IN DERMATO, STRATEGIC COMMUNICATION IN DERMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110901), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1545-9616, pages 990 - 1000, XP008146386 | - BERKÓ SZILVIA ET AL, "Advantages of cross-linked versus linear hyaluronic acid for semisolid skin delivery systems", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (20130415), vol. 49, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.EURPOLYMJ.2013.04.001, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 2511 - 2517, XP028689528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eurpolymj.2013.04.001 | - M. Essendoubi ET AL, "Human skin penetration of hyaluronic acid of different molecular weights as probed by Raman spectroscopy - Essendoubi - 2016 - Skin Research and Technology - Wiley Online Library", Skin Research and Technology, doi:10.1111/srt.12228, (20150416), pages 55 - 62, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/abs/10.1111/srt.12228, (20190510), XP055587612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/srt.12228 | - M. FARWICK ET AL, "Fifty-kDa Hyaluronic Acid Upregulates Some Epidermal Genes without Changing TNF-[alpha] Expression in Reconstituted Epidermis", SKIN PHARMACOLOGY AND PHYSIOLOGY, Basel, (20110101), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1159/000324296, ISSN 1660-5527, pages 210 - 217, XP055211222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000324296 | by applicant | - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, THE COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOC., (2002), pages 2930 - 36 | - ICI Handbook, pages 2979 - 84 | - ICI Handbook, pages 2962 - 71 |