EP3121053 - CLUSTER ILLUMINATION BY PIEZOELECTRICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gascon Rivera, María Cristina Ignacio Ramirez 424 int 5 Ladron de Guevara Guadalajara, Jalisco CP 44600 / MX | [2017/07] |
Former [2017/04] | 01 /
Gascon Rivera, María Cristina Ignacio Ramirez 424 int 5 46800 Guadalajara, Jalisco / MX | Representative(s) | Bonn, Roman Klemens Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16180847.2 | 22.07.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | US201562196056P | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196056 P | US201615216186 | 21.07.2016 Original published format: US201615216186 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3121053 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3121053 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60K37/02, G01D13/28, G01D13/02 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
G01D13/28 (US);
G01D11/28 (EP,US);
B60K2360/33 (EP,US);
B60K2360/695 (EP,US);
B60K2360/698 (EP,US);
G01D13/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | B60K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CLUSTER-BELEUCHTUNG DURCH PIEZOELEKTRISCHES MATERIAL | [2017/04] | English: | CLUSTER ILLUMINATION BY PIEZOELECTRICAL MATERIAL | [2017/04] | French: | ÉCLAIRAGE EN FAISCEAU POUR MATÉRIAU PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 30.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009168598 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1,13* abstract *; | [A]DE102013006124 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,13,16-18 * paragraphs [0028] - [0032] - [0034]; figures 1,2,4 * |