EP3125220 - MODEL OF AN ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekino, Hirokazu c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Seto, Takeshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Jiro c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 16181648.3 | 28.07.2016 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | JP20150150558 | 30.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015150558 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125220 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/30 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G09B23/28 (CN);
G09B23/285 (EP,US);
G09B23/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODELL EINES ORGANS | [2017/05] | English: | MODEL OF AN ORGAN | [2017/05] | French: | MODÈLE D'UN ORGANE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014205101 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045]; figures 1,6B,11 * [I] 2-5; | [A]JP2010243867 (FUSO RUBBER KOGYO KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012034587 (TOLY CHRISTOPHER C [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006184005 (SAKEZLES CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH064768 |