EP3277050 - RADIO ACCESS ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Gerd Tagwiese 23 66431 Weiterstadt / DE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Emmerling Patent- & Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/05] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16181838.0 | 29.07.2016 | [2018/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3277050 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3277050 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/16, H04W76/15 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H04W76/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (US);
H04W52/46 (US);
H04W74/02 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | FUNKZUGANGSENTITÄT | [2018/05] | English: | RADIO ACCESS ENTITY | [2018/05] | French: | ENTITE D'ACCES RADIO | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | NO | 09.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | LT | 09.10.2019 | |
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 09.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014078906 (CHEN WEI-PENG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2014204716 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0068] *; | [A]WO2016105568 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2010062800 (GUPTA LALIT [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US9002282 (DE LA BROISE JOSSELIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014032717 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |