EP3276983 - METHOD FOR FITTING AN AUDIO SIGNAL TO A HEARING DEVICE BASED ON HEARING-RELATED PARAMETER OF THE USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mimi Hearing Technologies GmbH Neue Schönhauser Strasse 19 10178 Berlin / DE | [2018/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Pascal Schulstraße 14 97633 Großbardorf / DE | 02 /
CLARK, Nicholas 13 Beldam Avenue Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 9UH / GB | 03 /
KNOOK, Guido Fürbringerstr. 25 10961 Berlin / DE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Schulz, Ben Jesko Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 16182016.2 | 29.07.2016 | [2018/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276983 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
H04R25/70 (EP);
H04M1/72403 (EP);
H04M1/6016 (EP);
H04M1/72442 (EP);
H04M3/42391 (EP);
H04R2225/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS AN EIN HÖRGERÄT AUF GRUNDLAGE VON GEHÖRBEZOGEN PARAMETERN DES BENUTZERS | [2018/05] | English: | METHOD FOR FITTING AN AUDIO SIGNAL TO A HEARING DEVICE BASED ON HEARING-RELATED PARAMETER OF THE USER | [2018/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADAPTATION D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO À UN DISPOSITIF AUDITIF BASÉ SUR UN PARAMÈTRE CONCERNANT L'AUDITION DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014314261 (SELIG AARON ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 16] , [0 21] , [0 42] , [0 43] , [0 45] , [0 62] *; | [X]WO2008086112 (SOUND ID [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039]; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2015281853 (EISNER MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0053] , [0 63] , [0 80] , [ 172] , [ 382] *; | [A]US2014193008 (ZUKIC TARIK [AT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 28] , [0 50] , [ 110] * | by applicant | US2004264719 | US7186930 |