EP3150803 - AIRFOIL AND METHOD OF COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUACH, San 31 Washington Ave. East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06108 / US | 02 /
GAUTSCHI, Steven Bruce 87 Washington Street Milton, MA Massachusetts 02186 / US | 03 /
DEVORE, Matthew A. 57 Stonehill Drive Rocky Hill, CT Connecticut 06067 / US | 04 /
LEWIS, Scott D. Grandview Terrace Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | 05 /
GLEINER, Matthew S. 5437 Wiseburn Street Hawthorne, CA California 90250 / US | 06 /
KING, Christoper 14 Robin Street Bristol, CT Connecticut 06010 / US | 07 /
CORCORAN, Christopher 28 Colgate Drive Manchester, CT Connecticut 06042 / US | 08 /
CHAPDELAINE, David Donald 48 1⁄2 Egypt Road Ellington, CT Connecticut 06029 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/35] |
Former [2017/14] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16182080.8 | 29.07.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | US201514871456 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: US201514871456 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150803 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150803 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20, // F01D5/18 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/307 (US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHAUFELPROFIL UND KÜHLVERFAHREN | [2017/14] | English: | AIRFOIL AND METHOD OF COOLING | [2017/14] | French: | PROFIL D'AUBE ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5192192 (OURHAAN TRACY R [US]) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,12,14,15 * figures 7-10 * [Y] 5,13; | [XY]US8469666 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14,15 * figures 4-6 *[Y] 5,13; | [X]US2014030102 (MISHRA NIRAJ KUMAR [IN], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,14,15 * figure - * | Examination | US5261789 | US6494678 | EP1422383 | EP2031186 | US8066485 | EP2434097 | US2014037458 | EP2851511 |