EP3127818 - COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING APPROACH OF AIRCRAFT AND AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation 2-15 Oye-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8555 / JP | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashio, Tomoka c/o Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation 2-15, Oye-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8555 / JP | 02 /
Tomita, Kotaro c/o Mitsubishi Aircraft Corporation 2-15, Oye-cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8555 / JP | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16182320.8 | 02.08.2016 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | JP20150155990 | 06.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015155990 | JP20150181554 | 15.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015181554 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127818 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64D45/00, G01C5/00 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
G01C5/005 (EP);
B64D45/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERSYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ANNÄHERUNG EINES FLUGZEUGES UND FLUGZEUG | [2017/06] | English: | COMPUTER SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING APPROACH OF AIRCRAFT AND AIRCRAFT | [2017/06] | French: | SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE DESTINÉ À DÉTERMINER L'APPROCHE D'AÉRONEF ET AÉRONEF | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 02.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/02] | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2384973 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009]; figures 1-3; claims 1,4,5,6,10 *; | [X]US4319218 (BATEMAN CHARLES D) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 85 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US7389164 (CONNER KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 44 - column 1, line 67 * * claims 1,5,7,12 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2002069019 (LIN CHING-FANG [US]) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,2 * | by applicant | JP2001033271 |