EP3136003 - OPERATING DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A CONTROL DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Daniel Westfalenweg 124 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
Radusin, Darko Traubenstraße 8 33803 Steinhagen / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16182750.6 | 04.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | DE201510114259 | 27.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015114259 | [2017/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136003 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, A47L15/42, D06F39/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F24C7/08 (EP,US);
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
D06F34/34 (EP,US);
A47L15/4293 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEDIENEN EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER BEDIENVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEDIENEN EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS | [2017/09] | English: | OPERATING DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE AND METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A CONTROL DEVICE FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE | [2017/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL MENAGER ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL MENAGER | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 06.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202007000047U (HANNEMANN ACHIM [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [I]US2011181516 (MALLORY LUCAS [US], et al) [I] 1,6,11,12,14 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE102011085341 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,5,10-12 * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4,6,7,13 [I] 8,9,14; | [Y]DE202013001940U (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 2-4,7,13 * figure 1; claims 8,1 *; | [Y]DE102014202444 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2390403 |