EP3135884 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION APPARATUS FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINODA, Yoshihisa c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16182975.9 | 05.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | JP20150158104 | 10.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015158104 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135884 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F01N3/20 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F01N3/2073 (EP,US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
B01D53/9495 (US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (EP,US);
F01N3/105 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
F02D41/025 (EP,US);
F02D41/0275 (EP,US);
F01N2250/12 (EP,US);
F01N2430/06 (EP,US);
F01N2900/1616 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1468 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1469 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2017/09] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION APPARATUS FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2017/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 05.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011138783 (SAKURAI KENJI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0068] , [0069] * * figures 1,5a,5b,6,7, * [A] 2-9; | [A]DE102013019025 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] *; | [A]EP2149684 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0025] * | by applicant | JP2008286102 |