EP3106140 - A BREATHABLE INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR TOPICAL REDUCED PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. 12930 IH-10 West San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US | ||
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | ||
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. Legal Department - Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKE, Christopher Brian P.O. Box 659508 c/o KCI Licensing Inc. San Antonio, TX Texas 78265 / US | 02 /
ROBINSON, Timothy Mark 27 Wellington Terrance Basingstoke, Hampshire RG23 8HH / GB | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/16] | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | ||
Former [2016/51] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16183077.3 | 08.02.2008 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | US20070900463P | 09.02.2007 Original published format: US 900463 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106140 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106140 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3106140 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61M27/00, A61M1/00, A61F13/02 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61F13/00 (KR);
A61F13/01017 (EP,US);
A61F13/01029 (US);
A61F13/01046 (US);
A61F13/0203 (EP,US);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61M1/75 (EP,US);
A61M1/913 (EP);
A61M1/915 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2016/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ATMUNGSSCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM FÜR REDUZIERTEN TOPISCHEN DRUCK | [2016/51] | English: | A BREATHABLE INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR TOPICAL REDUCED PRESSURE | [2016/51] | French: | SYSTEME D'INTERFACE PERMEABLE POUR PRESSION REDUITE TOPIQUE | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08725368.8 / EP2109427 | EP14186269.8 / EP2818144 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Smith and Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US Opponent's representative Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/08] | 01.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2020 | 23.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2020 | 04.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.04.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.10.2021 | Appeal received No. T1930/21 | 21.10.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.12.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2008 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | ES | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | IE | 08.02.2019 | LU | 08.02.2019 | MT | 08.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
MT | 08.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
MT | 08.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
MT | 08.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 18.04.2018 | |
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 18.04.2018 | |
ES | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]WO2008008032 (MOELNLYCKE HEALTH CARE AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 12; figure 1 * * page 7, line 13 - page 7, line 16 * * page 17, line 27 - page 18, line 20 * [I] 2-13; | [E]US2008195017 (ROBINSON TIMOTHY MARK [GB], et al) [E] 1-13 * figures 1-7; claims 1-25 *; | [E]WO2012143665 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [E] 1 * figures 1,6; claims 1-19 * * page 3, line 20 - page 3, line 25 ** page 7, line 21 - page 7, line 27 * | Opposition | US2004030304 | WO2006056294 | WO2006087021 | WO2007030601 | WO2008040681 | US2008119802 | WO2009002260 | US2010262090 |