EP3282600 - DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göhner, Matthias Kappishäuser Str. 61 72581 Dettingen/Erms / DE | 02 /
Wörner, Jörg 17 Wren Field Lane Pittsford, NY New York 14534 / US | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 16183328.0 | 09.08.2016 | [2018/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3282600 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3282600 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/114 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H04B10/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2021/23] |
Former [2018/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/07] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2018/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES | [2018/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 18.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102013001358 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8,13 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1; claim 1 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0009] * [Y] 2 [I] 3,4,6,9-12,14,15; | [IY]US2005129410 (WILSEY PHILIP A [US], et al) [I] 1,3-15 * paragraph [0041]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037]; figures 4,5,7, * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 2; | [A]US2002034950 (SAWADA MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2319742 | - "PARALLELE DATENUEBERTRAGUNG MIT LICHT. ÖEINSATZBEISPIELE AUS DEM INDUSTRIELLEN ALTAG", MESSEN UND PRUFEN, IVA INTERNATIONAL, MUNCHEN, DE, (19960501), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0937-3446, pages 14 - 16, XP000592379 |