EP3120888 - NASAL CAVITY INSERTION DEVICE FIXTURE AND NASAL CAVITY INSERTION DEVICE SET INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seven dreamers laboratories, inc. 3-14-4 Shiba Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Hiroshi c/o I.S.T. Corporation 5-13-13, Ichiriyama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2153 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Yosuke c/o I.S.T. Corporation 5-13-13, Ichiriyama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2153 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Yoshiki c/o I.S.T. Corporation 5-13-13, Ichiriyama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2153 / JP | 04 /
HIOKI, Kenji c/o I.S.T. Corporation 5-13-13, Ichiriyama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2153 / JP | 05 /
SAKANE, Shinichi c/o I.S.T. Corporation 5-13-13, Ichiriyama Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2153 / JP | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16183353.8 | 04.03.2011 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | JP20100049339 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010049339 | JP20100197664 | 03.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010197664 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120888 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61F2/82, A61F5/56, A61M15/08, A61M16/04 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A61F5/56 (EP,US);
A61M16/0461 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (US);
A61M39/10 (US);
A61M16/0488 (EP,US);
A61M2210/0618 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NASENHOHLRAUM-EINFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNGSHALTERUNG UND NASENHOHLRAUM-EINFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNGSSATZ DAMIT | [2017/04] | English: | NASAL CAVITY INSERTION DEVICE FIXTURE AND NASAL CAVITY INSERTION DEVICE SET INCLUDING THE SAME | [2017/04] | French: | ACCESSOIRE DE DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION DE CAVITÉ NASALE ET ENSEMBLE DE DISPOSITIFS D'INSERTION DE CAVITÉ NASALE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11750395.3 / EP2543407 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB191504148 (JOHNSON ERNEST STANLEY [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 36; figures 1,6,7 * [Y] 3; | [XY]US5097827 (IZUMI JOHN [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 53 - column 6, line 12; figures 1-11 * [Y] 3; | [XY]WO9823233 (CHRAP R P LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 3; | [XY]US2009248058 (KOTLER ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0031] , [0037]; figures 10,11 * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2009266365 (OBERLE PAUL [US]) [Y] 3* paragraph [0038]; figure 13 * | by applicant | GB191504148 | FR892937 | US2672138 | US3568678 | WO9823233 | JP2006204630 | JP2009034384 | US2009062927 | JP2009072581 | JP2009072582 | US2009248058 | US2009266365 | US2010030252 |