EP3281754 - KNIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DKB Household UK Limited Bridge House Eelmoor Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 7UE / GB | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 16183889.1 | 11.08.2016 | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281754 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B26B9/00, B26B3/00 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B26B9/00 (EP,US);
B26B3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSER | [2018/07] | English: | KNIVES | [2018/07] | French: | COUTEAUX | [2018/07] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5058305 (MAJESTY RUSSELL F [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,13-15 * column 3, lines 37-44; figure 1 * [I] 4,10-12; | [XI]US2004123471 (ONION KENNETH J [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,13 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 31] , [0 32]; figures 1-3, 8 * [I] 4,10,12; | [XI]US5365666 (GONZALEZ RENE G [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,13 * column 2, lines 41-60; figures 1, 4-7 * [I] 4; | [X]US2012192434 (SYRJALA JERRY [US]) [X] 1,5-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 25]; figures 1, 2, 8 * |