08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
20.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
12.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
06.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change - inventor |
|
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
18.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
24.09.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2018 |
First examination report |
|
09.03.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.03.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
09.03.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
17.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|