Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10734585 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2020 | B2 | US2017244042 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615050833 | 23.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170099329 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201615050833 | 23.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3211681 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP3211681 | 30.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615050833 | 23.02.2016 |