EP3284460 - SAPOSIN LIPOPROTEIN PARTICLES AND LIBRARIES FROM CRUDE MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salipro Biotech AB Greenhouse Labs Teknikringen 38A 114 28 Stockholm / SE | [2018/27] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Salipro Biotech AB Ekhagsvägen 2 11418 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRAUENFELD, Jens Ekhagsvägen 2 114 18 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
LÖVING, Robin Drottningholmsvägen 52 112 19 Stockholm / SE | [2018/23] |
Former [2018/08] | 01 /
FRAUENFELD, Jens Ekhagsvägen 2 114 18 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
LÖVING, Robin Solfagravägen 5 141 48 Huddinge / SE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16184843.7 | 19.08.2016 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284460 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
A61K38/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/6842 (US);
A61K39/0012 (US);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAPOSINLIPOPROTEINPARTIKEL UND BIBLIOTHEKEN AUS ROHEN MEMBRANEN | [2018/08] | English: | SAPOSIN LIPOPROTEIN PARTICLES AND LIBRARIES FROM CRUDE MEMBRANES | [2018/08] | French: | PARTICULES DE LIPOPROTÉINE SAPOSINE ET BIBLIOTHÈQUES À MEMBRANES BRUTES | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 02.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014095576 (FRAUENFELD JENS [SE]); | by applicant | EP1345959 | EP1596828 | WO2014095576 | WO2015036549 |