EP3122030 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS THROUGH USER TERMINAL, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND USER TERMINAL FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring, TX 77389 / US | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states HP Printing Korea Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states S-Printing Solution Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Soo-young 140-1602, 498, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si / KR | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16184932.8 | 28.08.2015 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | KR20140113344 | 28.08.2014 Original published format: KR 20140113344 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122030 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
H04N1/00472 (EP,US);
H04N1/00222 (CN);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04N1/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N1/00315 (CN);
H04N1/00408 (CN);
H04N1/00477 (EP,US);
H04N1/00933 (EP,US);
H04N1/00938 (EP,US);
H04N1/00954 (EP,US);
H04N1/4413 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG DURCH EIN BENUTZERENDGERÄT SOWIE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2017/04] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS THROUGH USER TERMINAL, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND USER TERMINAL FOR PERFORMING THE METHOD | [2017/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCÉDÉ | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 19.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2021 | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/28] | 05.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/28] | 30.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15182983.5 / EP2996320 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007081186 (NUMATA MASAHITO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007127054 (NISHIZAWA AYAKO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012086965 (KANG KYUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0133] - [0135] - [0143] - [0159]; figures 3, 7, 9; table 3 *; | [A]US2005179944 (GASSHO KAZUHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0132]; figures 10-14 * |