EP3121844 - ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM SonoSite, Inc. 21919 30th Drive SE Bothell, WA 98021-3904 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUKACS, Marc 409-29 Camden Street Toronto, Ontario M5V 3N3 / CA | 02 /
CHAGGARES, Chris 970 Glenbourne Court Oshawa, Ontario L1K 2P8 / CA | 03 /
HIRSON, Desmond 73 Ventura Avenue Thornhill, Ontario L4J 7T4 / CA | 04 /
PANG, Guofeng 9 Brocklesby Crescent Ajax, Ontario L1T 2H9 / CA | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2017/04] | Magrath, Sally Ann Mason Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16185029.2 | 18.09.2009 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | US20080192690P | 18.09.2008 Original published format: US 192690 P | US20080192661P | 18.09.2008 Original published format: US 192661 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3121844 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3121844 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121844 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/64, H04R17/00, H04R31/00, H01L21/768, H01L41/047, B06B1/06, A61B8/13, A61B8/14, A61B8/00, H01L41/29 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
B06B1/0622 (EP,CN,US);
A61B8/543 (US);
A61B8/13 (US);
A61B8/14 (US);
H10N30/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2017/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLWANDLER | [2017/04] | English: | ULTRASOUND TRANSDUCERS | [2017/04] | French: | TRANSDUCTEURS À ULTRASONS | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09813954.6 / EP2345066 | Divisional application(s) | EP17190476.6 / EP3309823 | EP19186487.5 / EP3576137 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2009 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | IE | 18.09.2019 | LU | 18.09.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 18.09.2009 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5091893 (SMITH LOWELL S [US], et al); | [Y]US5841075 (HANSON DAVID A [US]); | [Y]US2002129477 (BUREAU JEAN-MARC [FR], et al); | [Y]US2007001259 (PALANDUZ CENGIZ A [US]); | [Y]US2007182287 (LUKACS MARC [CA], et al); | [Y]US2007205698 (CHAGGARES N C [CA], et al); | by applicant | US7230368 | US2007205698 | US2007205697 | US2007222339 |