08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
13.11.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
06.12.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] |
05.12.2019 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
04.12.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
05.07.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
01.04.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.03.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
13.02.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
03.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
08.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
08.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
08.09.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
25.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
22.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|