EP3167882 - USE OF FENOFIBRATE OR A DERIVATIVE THEREOF FOR PREVENTING DIABETIC RETINOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BGP Products Operations GmbH Hegenheimermattweg 127 4123 Allschwil / CH | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSQUER, Jean-Claude 14 rue Clément Janin F-21000 Dijon / FR | 02 /
KEECH, Anthony 29 Sofala Avenue Riverview Sydney, New South Wales / AU | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2017/20] | O'Connell, Maura FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16185410.4 | 10.11.2006 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | EP20050292388 | 10.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05292388 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167882 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167882 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/215, A61K31/216, A61K31/19, A61K31/192, A61P27/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/215 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON FENOFIBRAT ODER EINEM DERIVAT DAVON ZUR PRÄVENTION VON DIABETISCHER RETINOPATHIE | [2017/20] | English: | USE OF FENOFIBRATE OR A DERIVATIVE THEREOF FOR PREVENTING DIABETIC RETINOPATHY | [2017/20] | French: | UTILISATION DU FÉNOFIBRATE OU L'UN DE SES DÉRIVÉS POUR LA PRÉVENTION DE LA RÉTINOPATHIE DIABÉTIQUE | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/20] | UTILISATION DE FÉNOFIBRATE OU D'UN DE SES DÉRIVÉS POUR LA PRÉVENTION DE LA RÉTINOPATHIE DIABÉTIQUE | Examination procedure | 23.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 30.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06829976.7 / EP1954261 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.08.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 23.08.2016 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2017 | 30.11.2017 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0482498 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [Y]WO02080936 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]); | [Y]EP1325745 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2004052362 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2004066963 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [YD]US2005148594 (CINK RUSSELL D [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005074909 (GRELAN PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [YP]EP1714648 (ASKA PHARM CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | WO8201649 | US4800079 | US4895726 | US4961890 | EP0793958 | US6042847 | US6074670 | WO0072825 | WO02067901 | US2005148594 |