Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
10.10.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.01.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
25.08.2016 | Change - representative |