EP3135941 - A PROTECTIVE EMBODIMENT WITH EXTENDED EXPECTED LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tirsan Kardan Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Organize Sanayi Bölgesi Atatürk Caddesi No.7 45030 Manisa / TR | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASARAN, Ayça Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | 02 /
TASAN, Korkut Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | 03 /
KORUK, Adnan Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | 04 /
ÖZBAKIS, Murat Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Yamankaradeniz, Kemal, et al Destek Patent, Inc. Maslak Mah. Büyükdere Cad., No: 243 Kat: 13, Spine Tower, Sariyer 34485 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Dereligil, Ersin Destek Patent, Inc. Konak Mah. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Blok No: 36/5 16110 Besevler Nilufer Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 16185433.6 | 24.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | TR20150010477 | 24.08.2015 Original published format: TR 201510477 | [2017/09] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135941 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/84 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F16D3/845 (EP);
F16D3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHÜTZENDE AUSFÜHRUNGSFORM MIT VERLÄNGERTER ERWARTETER LEBENSDAUER | [2017/09] | English: | A PROTECTIVE EMBODIMENT WITH EXTENDED EXPECTED LIFE | [2017/09] | French: | MODE DE RÉALISATION PROTECTEUR AYANT UNE DURÉE DE VIE PROLONGÉE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US1922431 (GEYER HARVEY D) [I] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [I]GB913185 (BOEHLER & CO AG GEB) [I] 1 * page 1, line 56 - line 73 *; | [I]EP0061320 (GATES RUBBER CO [US]) [I] 1 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 10 *; | [X]DE4423601 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 1 - line 43 *; | [I]US6237920 (NICOLAI MICHAEL [DE], et al) [I] 1 * column 2, line 33 - line 39 *; | [I]US2003127908 (LYON JAMES ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0051] *; | [I]WO2004071797 (GKN AUTOMOTIVE INC [US]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]JP2006027353 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1 * figure 3 ** abstract * |