Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10246830 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2017284034 | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715624125 | 15.06.2017 | US201514834005 | 24.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017035210 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514834005 | 24.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9708777 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2017058461 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514834005 | 24.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3199703 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | B1 | EP3199703 | 02.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514834005 | 24.08.2015 |