EP3136544 - BATTERY WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greatbatch Ltd. 10000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, NY 14031 / US | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Electrochem Solutions, Inc. 10,000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, NY 14031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peterson, Brian R. 23 Mashie Road Cumberland, RI 02864 / US | 02 /
Jankins, Eric 385 Judson Street Raynham, MA 02767 / US | 03 /
Robnett, Ronald H. 1725 Ocean Front Walk; No. 313 Santa Monica, CA 90401 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16185667.9 | 26.02.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | US201562121307P | 26.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562121307 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136544 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/10, H02J50/90, H02J7/02, H02J7/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES BATTERIELADESYSTEM | [2017/09] | English: | BATTERY WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM | [2017/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE SANS FIL | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16157719.2 / EP3062418 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013249479 (PARTOVI AFSHIN [US]) [X] 1-6* paragraphs [0074] - [0078]; figures 1,4, 6,7,40 * | by applicant | US2012235634 | US8461719 |