08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
03.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
19.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
10.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
06.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.04.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
14.02.2020 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
24.01.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
30.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
24.02.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
26.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|