Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020051497 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615210842 | 14.07.2016 | US201916655025 | 16.10.2019 | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 | US201816223054 | 17.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10482811 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2019 | B2 | US2019122608 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615210842 | 14.07.2016 | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 | US201816223054 | 17.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10186191 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B2 | US2017162111 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102465379B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2022 | B1 | KR20170065059 | 13.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107025875B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B | CN107025875 | 08.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3176772 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2019 | B1 | EP3176772 | 07.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20150170668 | 02.12.2015 |