EP3135208 - STAPLES CONFIGURED TO SUPPORT AN IMPLANTABLE ADJUNCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC 475 Street C Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
SWAYZE, Jeffrey S. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16185863.4 | 26.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | US201514836294 | 26.08.2015 Original published format: US201514836294 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3135208 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3135208 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3135208 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/064, A61B17/072, A61B17/04, A61B17/115 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (RU,US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/0401 (RU,US);
A61B17/0469 (RU,US);
A61B17/064 (US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/32 (US);
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00831 (US);
A61B2017/00889 (US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00964 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0472 (US);
A61B2017/06042 (US);
A61B2017/0645 (US);
A61B2017/07214 (US);
A61B2017/07221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07228 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07235 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1142 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (US);
A61B2017/320052 (US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLAMMERN ZUM TRAGEN EINES IMPLANTIERBAREN ZUSATZES | [2017/09] | English: | STAPLES CONFIGURED TO SUPPORT AN IMPLANTABLE ADJUNCT | [2017/09] | French: | AGRAFES CONFIGURÉES POUR SUPPORTER UN COMPLÉMENT IMPLANTABLE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19194580.7 / EP3607890 | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2016 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5542594 (MCKEAN WANDA L [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 12 - line 37; figure - *; | [YA]US2009001121 (HESS CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0181]; figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0197] - paragraph [0208]; figures 58-84 * * paragraph [0229] - paragraph [0231]; figures 123-127 * [A] 13,14,18; | [A]US8056789 (WHITE NATHAN H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 51 - line 59; figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]EP2700367 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0095]; figure - *; | [A]US2014263570 (HOPKINS TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117]; figures 40-46D *; | [A]EP2891460 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0049]; figures 16, 17 * | by applicant | US5403312 | US7000818 | US2007175955 | US7422139 | US7464849 | US7670334 | US7753245 | US2010264194 | US7845537 | US7980443 | WO2012013577 | US8210411 | US8220688 | US8308040 | US8393514 | US8561870 | US8608045 | US8733613 | US2014263551 | US2014263552 | US9072535 | US9101358 | - YAN, "COMPARISON OF THE EFFECTS OF Mg-6Zn AND Ti-3AI-2.5V ALLOYS ON TGF-?/TNF-?/VEGF/b-FGF IN THE HEALING OF THE INTESTINAL TRACT IN VIVO", BIOMED. MATER., (2014), vol. 9, page 025011 | - ERDMANN, "; EVALUATION OF THE SOFT TISSUE BIOCOMPATIBILITY OF MgCa0.8 AND SURGICAL STEEL 316L IN VIVO: A COMPARATIVE STUDY IN RABBITS", BIOMED. ENG. ONLINE, (2010), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1186/1475-925X-9-63, page 63, XP021077706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-925X-9-63 | - BRAR, "INVESTIGATION OF THE MECHANICAL AND DEGRADATION PROPERTIES OF Mg-Sr AND Mg-Zn-Sr ALLOYS FOR USE AS POTENTIAL BIODEGRADABLE IMPLANT MATERIALS", J. MECH, BEHAVIOR OF BIOMED. MAT., (2012), vol. 7, pages 87 - 95 | - LI, "Mg-Zr-Sr ALLOYS AS BIODEGRADABLE IMPLANT MATERIALS", ACTA BIOMATERIALIA, (2012), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.actbio.2012.04.028, pages 3177 - 3188, XP028500426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actbio.2012.04.028 | US20080031573 |