EP3138745 - WIPER DEVICE FOR CLEANING VEHICLE WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | Opposition rejected | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAIBLE, Siegfried Hofwiesen 10 74223 Flein / DE | 02 /
SCHOBER, Claudia P.O. Box Jenaweg 1 Jenaweg 1 71672 Marbach / DE | 03 /
KALMBACH, Kristina P.O. Box Marbacher Weg 5 Marbacher Weg 55 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Valeo Visibility Service Propriété Industrielle c/o Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Callu-Danseux, Violaine Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle ZA L'Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand, CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | ||
Former [2017/10] | Callu Danseux, Violaine Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage Service Propriété Industrielle ZA L'Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand, CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | Application number, filing date | 16185921.0 | 26.08.2016 | [2017/10] | Priority number, date | DE201510114925 | 07.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015114925 | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3138745 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3138745 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38, B60S1/40 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
B60S1/522 (EP,US);
B60S1/52 (CN);
B60S1/32 (CN);
B60S1/3856 (US);
B60S1/4048 (EP,US);
B60S1/42 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] | Title | German: | WISCHVORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON FAHRZEUGSCHEIBEN | [2017/10] | English: | WIPER DEVICE FOR CLEANING VEHICLE WINDOWS | [2017/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESSUIE-GLACE SERVANT À NETTOYER DES VITRES DE VÉHICULE | [2017/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.2019
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/34] | 01.08.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.12.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2020 | 16.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.12.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.09.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/47] | Appeal following opposition | 13.12.2021 | Appeal received No. T2180/21 | 13.12.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 12.04.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.09.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2016 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | IE | 26.08.2019 | LU | 26.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | GB | 26.08.2021 | IT | 26.08.2021 | SE | 27.08.2021 | [2022/36] |
Former [2022/35] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MK | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
GB | 26.08.2021 | ||
SE | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/32] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MK | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
SE | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
SE | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102004007351 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1985513 (FEDERAL MOGUL IGNITION SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 7,8,10 *; | [A]WO2014020279 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE102012224474 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR3015398 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | DE102004007351 | Opposition | GB2186021 | EP0330458 | WO9906252 | DE10130903 | DE60013387T | DE102010064178 | DE102011012245 | DE102013208576 | US2015217731 |