EP3175819 - METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING A RAPID PROTOTYPE OVERMOLD FOR LOCATING A DENTAL IMPLANT ANALOG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet 3I, LLC 4555 Riverside Drive Palm Beach Gardens Florida 33410 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Powell, Theodore, M. 1093 Viewpoint Drive Lake in the Hills, IL 60156 / US | 02 /
Berckmans, Bruce 2426 Country Oaks Lane Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US | 03 /
Suttin, Zachary, B. 10436 Orchid Reserve Drive West Palm Beach, FL 33412 / US | 04 /
Rogers, Dan, P. 5188 Woodland Lakes Drive Apt 334 Palm Beach Gradens, FL33418 / US | 05 /
Robb, T., Tait 6925 S.W. Adrianna Court Stuwart, FL 34997 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London, EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 16186406.1 | 19.10.2006 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | US20050729506P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729506 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175819 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C1/00, A61C11/00, G06K9/00, G06T15/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C1/00 (KR);
A61C13/0019 (EP,US);
A61C9/0053 (EP,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM RAPID PROTOTYPING UMSPRITZUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES DENTALIMPLANTATANALOGS | [2017/23] | English: | METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING A RAPID PROTOTYPE OVERMOLD FOR LOCATING A DENTAL IMPLANT ANALOG | [2017/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SURMOULAGE PAR RAPID PROTOTYPING POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT D'UN ANALOGUE D'UN IMPLANT DENTAIRE | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 07.06.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 16.07.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06817189.1 / EP1940310 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5527182 (WILLOUGHBY ANDREW J M [BS]) [X] 1-15 * column 50, line 8 - column 53, line 30 *; | [X]US6296483 (CHAMPLEBOUX GUILLAUME [FR]) [X] 1-15* figure - * | by applicant | US5338198 | US5652709 | US5851115 |