EP3290387 - A LOAD PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenieursbureau Wuylens BVBA Vossenberglaan 10 9070 Destelbergen / BE | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wuylens, Philippe Vossenberglaan 10 9070 Destelbergen / BE | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 16186651.2 | 31.08.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290387 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/10, B66F9/12, B66F9/18 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B66F9/12 (EP);
B66F9/10 (EP);
B66F9/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADESCHUTZ | [2018/10] | English: | A LOAD PROTECTOR | [2018/10] | French: | PROTECTEUR DE CHARGE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10291793 (KOMATSU FORKLIFT) [AD] 1,16 * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [AD]US2013277151 (GIANNETTI MIRCO [IT]) [AD] 1,16 * abstract * * figures 8,9 *; | [A]US2009008951 (WHETSTINE ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29724786U (SIEMAG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202015107017U (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 1,16 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [A]GB1024188 (CLAUS GROTH) [A] 1,16 * page 1, line 56 - line 58 * * page 1, line 72 - line 74 * * page 1, line 80 - line 83 * * figure - *; | [A]US2005115010 (JACKSON THOMAS D [US]) [A] 1,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | GB2478410 | GB247841 | US2013277151 | JPH10291793 |