EP3169061 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adeia Guides Inc. 3025 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2024/36] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | ||
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordray, Charles 200 Mercer Street, Apt. 2B New York, New York 10012 / US | 02 /
Walker, Todd A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 03 /
Armaly, Samir B. 4400 Belair Drive La Canada, California 91011 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Pisani, Diana Jean Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | ||
Former [2017/20] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16186673.6 | 08.12.2006 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | US20050324156 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 324156 | US20050323464 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 323464 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169061 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169061 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N5/445, H04N21/45, H04N21/482 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H04N7/16 (EP);
H04N21/252 (EP);
H04N21/42206 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP);
H04N21/466 (EP);
H04N21/4667 (EP);
H04N21/4751 (EP);
H04N21/4826 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR EPISODENVERFOLGUNG IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN MEDIENUMGEBUNG | [2017/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT | [2017/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI D'ÉPISODE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INTERACTIF MULTIMÉDIA | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839252.1 / EP1969844 | EP09013672.2 / EP2169952 | EP14177889.4 / EP2802142 | Divisional application(s) | EP16207344.9 / EP3206393 | EP17210591.8 / EP3346697 | EP17210592.6 / EP3346698 | EP20183325.8 / EP3739876 | EP20183327.4 / EP3754972 | EP24185538.6 / EP4415372 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2021
27.01.2021
ADMISSIBLE RTL Deutschland GmbH Picassoplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kiani, Nassim Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2021
Mediengruppe RTL Deutschland GmbH Picassoplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kiani, Nassim Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 05.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.09.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 08.11.2022 | Appeal received No. T2435/22 | 08.11.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.01.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 08.12.2020 | LU | 08.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2006 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.04.2020 | |
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 22.04.2020 | |
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0184340 (ON24 INC [US]); | [Y]WO0207433 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [Y]US2003208763 (MCELHATTEN DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2004111756 (STUCKMAN BRUCE E [US], et al); | [Y]JP2004343520 (SHARP KK); | [Y]EP1534014 (ENSEQUENCE INC [US]); | [Y]US2005235316 (AHMAD-TAYLOR TY O [US]) | Examination | US2003190150 | by applicant | US2001047298 | US2003149988 | US2005229213 |