EP3291103 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING A SNAPSHOT OF A SUBSET OF A DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOIKHMAN, Shay c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 02 /
ILIOPOULOS, Antonios c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 03 /
LEVY, Eliezer c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | [2018/26] |
Former [2018/10] | 01 /
GOIKHMAN, Shay c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
ILIOPOULOS, Anthony c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | |||
03 /
LEVY, Eliezer c/o Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/10] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16186857.5 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291103 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291103 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F12/1009, G06F16/23 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
G06F12/023 (EP,US);
G06F11/1451 (US);
G06F11/14 (US);
G06F16/23 (EP,US);
G06F16/24542 (US);
G06F16/953 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | G06F17/30, G06F12/1009 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER MOMENTAUFNAHME EINER TEILMENGE EINER DATENBANK | [2018/10] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING A SNAPSHOT OF A SUBSET OF A DATABASE | [2018/10] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CREATION DE COPIES INSTANTANEES D'UN SOUS-ENSEMBLE DE BASE DE DONNEES | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 19.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 01.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013073513 (KEMPER ALFONS [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] ** claims 1-18 *; | [XY] - KEVIN ELPHINSTONE ET AL, "Supporting Persistent Object Systems in a Single Address Space", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON PERSISTENT OBJECT SYSTEMS, (1997), XP055337844 [X] 1-5,7-9,14,15 * page 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 3-5 * * page 3, paragraphs 1-5 * * page 4, paragraphs 4-7 * * page 5, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 7, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 8, paragraphs 1-2 * * figures 2,5,6 * [Y] 11 |