EP3159678 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTION AND DISCRIMINATION OF A MOLECULAR OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Hung-Chun No. 9, Alley 6, Lane 479, Sec. 1 Jingguo Rd. East District 300 Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
Chu, Chang-Sheng 1F., No. 16, Alley 50, Lane 367 Sec. 1, Guangfu Rd. East District 300 Hsinchu City / TW | 03 /
Li, Ming-Chia No. 149, Zhongxiao St. Dajia Dist. 437 Taichung City / TW | 04 /
Li, Yu-Tang 9F., No. 15, Ln. 68, Sec. 1 Xuefu Rd. Tucheng Dist. 236 New Taipei City / TW | 05 /
Chiou, Chung Fan No. 69, Sanmin Rd. Qionglin Township 307 Hsinchu County / TW | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16186952.4 | 10.03.2010 | [2017/17] | Priority number, date | US20090159310P | 11.03.2009 Original published format: US 159310 P | US20100720352 | 09.03.2010 Original published format: US 720352 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159678 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3159678 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, C12Q1/68 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,KR,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP,KR,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/27 (KR);
G01N21/645 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/483 (KR);
C12Q2537/157 (US);
C12Q2563/107 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2537/157 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON EINEM MOLEKULAREN OBJEKT | [2017/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTION AND DISCRIMINATION OF A MOLECULAR OBJECT | [2017/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA DISCRIMINATION D'UN OBJET MOLÉCULAIRE | [2019/03] |
Former [2017/17] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LA DISCRIMINATION DE'UN OBJET MOLÉCULAIRE | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10750363.3 / EP2300801 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2010 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 10.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5674743 (ULMER KEVIN M [US]) [A] 1-16* figure 9 *; | [A]US5717602 (KENNING GREGORY G [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 7A-7D *; | [A]US6210973 (PETTIT JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 4, line 10 - column 4, line 30 *; | [A]US2002090630 (HAZAMA MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1, 3 *; | [A]WO2005019419 (SINGULEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * p.31,l.26-37 *; | [A]US2005275839 (ROBINSON JOSEPH P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-2,6 * | by applicant | US4748111 | US5034613 | US5750341 | US6013434 | US6153737 | US6197513 | US6344653 | WO03003015 | US2004038331 | US6946249 | US2006068506 | WO2006073504 | US2007141598 | US2008037008 | US2008081769 | US2008087843 | US7361466 | US2008199932 | - MCGUIRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 317, page 1687 | - S. M. SZE, Physics of Semiconductor Devices, WILEY, (2007), pages 674 - 675 | - D. A. NEAMEN, Semiconductor Physics & Devices, MCGRAWHILL, (1997), pages 17 - 18 | - SHENDURE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 309, pages 1728 - 1732 | - HARRIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 320, pages 106 - 109 | - LEVIN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 34, no. 20, page 142 | - ADEESI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, page 87 | - KIM ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 376, pages 612 - 616 | - KAMTEKAR ET AL., MOL. CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 609 - 618 | - KORLACH ET AL., PNAS, (2008), vol. 105, pages 1176 - 1181 | - SHENDURE ET AL., NAT. REV. GENET., (2004), vol. 5, pages 335 - 44 | - LEVENE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, pages 682 - 686 | - KORLACH ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 1176 - 1181 | - EID ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 323, pages 133 - 138 | - ZHANG ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 826 - 31 | - MEDNITZ ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 235 - 46 | - J. MED. VIROL., (2006), vol. 78, pages 202 - 207 |