EP3141101 - APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF A LAWNMOWER HANDLE AND TILTING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stiga S.p.A. in breve anche St. S.p.A. Via del Lavoro, 6 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states GGP Italy S.p.A. Via del Lavoro, 6 31033 Castelfranco Veneto (TV) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACCHIN, Gian Luca Via Brenta, 127 31033 CASTELFRANCO VENETO (TV) / IT | 02 /
BASTASIN, Franco Via Carlo Goldoni, 21 31100 TREVISO / IT | 03 /
D'AGOSTINI, Mauro Via Motta Susanna, 4B 35018 SAN MARTINO DI LUPARI (PD) / IT | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Andrea, et al MITTLER & C. s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [2017/11] | Application number, filing date | 16187834.3 | 08.09.2016 | [2017/11] | Priority number, date | IT2015UB03551 | 11.09.2015 Original published format: IT UB20153551 | [2017/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3141101 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3141101 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/82 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A01D34/824 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2017/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSTELLUNG DER HÖHE EINES RASENMÄHERGRIFFS UND ZUR NEIGUNG DAVON | [2017/11] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING THE HEIGHT OF A LAWNMOWER HANDLE AND TILTING IT | [2017/11] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER LA HAUTEUR D'UNE POIGNÉE DE TONDEUSE À GAZON ET DE LA BASCULER | [2017/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 05.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2016 | AL | 16.05.2018 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | PT | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | RS | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IE | 08.09.2018 | LU | 08.09.2018 | MT | 08.09.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MK | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
MT | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 16.05.2018 | ||
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
MT | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PT | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
MT | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
MT | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
MT | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.05.2018 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.09.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
RS | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2026928 (WOLF GERAETE GMBH) [A] 1 * page 1, line 103 - page 2, line 67; figure - *; | [AD]WO2005122745 (GARDENA MFG GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 23 - page 8, line 6; figure - *; | [A]DE202013005119U (VIKING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1* paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0059]; figure - *; | [AD]EP2777377 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2015114003 (GGP ITALY SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 13 - page 11, line 25; figure - * | by applicant | WO2005122745 | EP2777377 |