Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7208283B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2023 | B2 | JP2021098091 | 01.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019512188 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6989593B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2022 | B2 | JP2019528846 | 17.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US49080 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117162149 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US49080 | 29.08.2017 | CN201780045785 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109476027 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US49080 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017322226B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2020 | B2 | AU2017322226 | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US49080 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019004655 | 06.09.2022 | B1 | BR112019004655 | 28.05.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US49080 | 29.08.2017 | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018048674 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10773401 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2020 | B2 | US2018071929 | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3292963 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP3292963 | 14.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16188222 | 09.09.2016 |