|
15.03.2024 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2024 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2024 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2024 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2024 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2024 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2023 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.09.2023 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.09.2023 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2022 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2022 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2022 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2021 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2021 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.10.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2017 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.11.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
180 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
312 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
220 |