EP3130957 - CURVED OPTICAL FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RealD Inc. 100 N. Crescent Drive, Suite 120 Beverly Hills, CA 90210 / US | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLEMAN, David A RealD Inc. 100 North Crescent Drive Suite 120 Beverly Hills, CA California 90210 / US | 02 /
SHARP, Gary D RealD Inc. 100 North Crescent Drive Suite 120 Beverly Hills, CA California 90210 / US | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Mears, Andrew David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 16188818.5 | 10.10.2008 | [2017/07] | Priority number, date | US20070979326P | 11.10.2007 Original published format: US 979326 P | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3130957 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/26, B29D11/00, G02B5/30, B32B37/12, B32B38/18 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
B29D11/00634 (EP,CN,US);
G02B27/28 (KR);
G02B5/3083 (CN);
B29D11/00644 (US);
B29D11/0073 (EP,US);
B32B38/1866 (EP,US);
G02B30/25 (EP,CN,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0034 (EP,US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,US);
B32B37/12 (EP,US);
B32B38/18 (CN);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1007 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1744 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | GEKRÜMMTE OPTISCHE FILTER | [2017/07] | English: | CURVED OPTICAL FILTERS | [2017/07] | French: | FILTRES OPTIQUES INCURVES | [2017/07] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08838556.2 / EP2201422 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1804094 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] - [0 55] , [0072] - [0073] * [A] 2-7; | [A]JPH095683 (TSUTSUNAKA PLASTIC KOGYO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001305341 (TSUTSUNAKA PLASTIC KOGYO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9408266 (ANDREA EYEWEAR INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * pages 17-22 * | by applicant | US4792850 | US7106509 | US5051309 | US6177032 | US20060424087 | US20040576707 | US20010754091 |