EP3135658 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUOROPROPENE BY GAS PHASE FLUORINATION OF PENTACHLOROPROPANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEUR-BERT, Dominique 284F Chemin du Montellier 69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
DOUCET, Nicolas 6, rue du vieux Cuvry 57420 Cuvry / FR | 03 /
PIGAMO, Anne 9 rue de la Chapelle de Bel Air 69340 Francheville / FR | 04 /
WENDLINGER, Laurent 18 Hameau des Pierres Blanches 69510 Soucieu en Jarrest / FR | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Leca, François Michel ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2017/09] | Leca, François Michel Arkema France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16189218.7 | 21.01.2011 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3135658 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3135658 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3135658 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C17/383, C07C17/42, C07C21/18 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C07C17/383 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/866 (CN,US);
B01J27/125 (CN,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,CN,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,CN,US);
C07C17/42 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (US,CN,EP);
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (US,CN,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (US,CN,EP);
C07C17/383, C07C21/18 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUORPROPEN DURCH GASPHASENFLUORIERUNG VON PENTACHLOROPROPAN | [2017/09] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2,3,3,3-TETRAFLUOROPROPENE BY GAS PHASE FLUORINATION OF PENTACHLOROPROPANE | [2017/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE 2,3,3,3-TÉTRAFLUOROPROPÈNE PAR FLUORATION EN PHASE GAZEUSE DE PENTACHLOROPROPANE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11717005.0 / EP2665694 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 02.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2011 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | GB | 21.01.2021 | IE | 21.01.2021 | LU | 21.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MK | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MK | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
GB | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]WO2007079431 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13 [I] 12,13; | [XI]US2007197842 (MUKHOPADHYAY SUDIP [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [I] 12,13; | [Y]WO2009003157 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009003084 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13*the whole document; in particular, the examples*; | [XDI]WO2009015317 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-11 * the whole document * [I] 12,13; | [Y]WO2009018561 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XYI]EP2103587 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13 [I] 12,13; | [Y]US2009287026 (KOPKALLI HALUK [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB1091103 | US4902838 | WO2005108334 | WO2009015317 | US2009240090 | WO2009158321 | WO2010123148 |