EP3196997 - PORTABLE SUBSTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSIS Co., Ltd. 127, LS-ro Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-Do 14119 / KR | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jaegul LSIS R&D Campus, 40, LS-ro 116beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si 14118 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | K&L Gates LLP Karolinen Karree Karlstraße 12 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 16189467.0 | 19.09.2016 | [2017/30] | Priority number, date | KR20160000322U | 20.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160000322 U | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196997 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02B7/06 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H02B7/06 (EP,US);
H02B1/301 (CN,US);
H02B1/308 (CN,US);
H02B1/06 (US);
H02B1/012 (US);
H02B1/52 (US);
H02B1/565 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRBARE ELEKTRISCHE UNTERSTATION | [2017/30] | English: | PORTABLE SUBSTATION | [2017/30] | French: | SOUS-STATION ÉLECTRIQUE MOBILE | [2017/30] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 08.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2237812 (DE BLIEUX EARL V) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 47 - page 2, column 1, lines 11,60-69; figure 1 *; | [A]CA1057842 (RTE CORP) [A] 1,3* page 1 *; | [I]DE3115653 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [I] 1-7 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [XI]DE19650931 (DRIESCHER SPEZIALFAB FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, lines 9,30-55 * * column 3, lines 7-17,37-58; figure - * [I] 3,5-7; | [XI]US8427814 (GONCE JEFFREY A [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 21; figure - * [I] 3-7 |