EP3296647 - ENERGY DISTRIBUTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.ON Sverige AB Nobelvägen 66 205 09 Malmö / SE | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENQVIST, Fredrik Carl Westmans Allé 1 254 51 Helsingborg / SE | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 16189586.7 | 20.09.2016 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3296647 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24D10/00, F24D11/02 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
F24D10/003 (EP,KR);
F24D10/006 (US);
F24D11/0207 (EP,KR);
F24D19/1006 (EP,KR,US);
F24D19/1072 (EP,KR,US);
F24D2200/12 (EP,KR,US);
F24D2200/13 (EP,KR,US);
F24D2220/06 (EP,KR,US);
Y02B30/17 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/12] | English: | ENERGY DISTRIBUTING SYSTEM | [2018/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 15.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3123875 (AGA CTC VAERMEVAEXLARE AB [SE]) [X] 1-7,10-12 * the whole document *[A] 8,9,13-15; | [XAI]WO2010102626 (DANFOSS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,10,12 * page 10, paragraph l - page 11, paragraph 2; figure - * [A] 8,9,13-15 [I] 4,6,11; | [XI]GB2522025 (GREENFIELD MASTER IPCO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-12 * page 2 - page 9; figure 1 * [I] 13-15 |