EP3299345 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPTICAL BLANK FROM SYNTHETIC QUARTZ GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG Quarzstrasse 8 63450 Hanau / DE | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASKE, Andreas Ernst-Reuter-Straße 16 63486 Bruchkoebel / DE | 02 /
BECKER, Klaus Kurfürstenstrasse 35 63452 Hanau / DE | 03 /
OCHS, Stefan Am Heiligenstock 15 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Staudt, Armin Walter Sandeldamm 24a 63450 Hanau / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16190056.8 | 22.09.2016 | [2018/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299345 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3299345 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/014, C03B19/14, C03B20/00 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
C03B37/01446 (EP,CN);
C03B37/01486 (CN);
C03B19/1453 (EP,CN,US);
C03B19/1469 (EP,CN,US);
C03B19/1484 (EP,US);
C03B20/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2018/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ROHLINGS AUS SYNTHETISCHEM QUARZGLAS | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPTICAL BLANK FROM SYNTHETIC QUARTZ GLASS | [2018/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE EBAUCHE OPTIQUE EN VERRE DE QUARTZ SYNTHETIQUE | [2018/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 17.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2016 | AL | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | ES | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | IT | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | PL | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | IE | 22.09.2019 | LU | 22.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.09.2016 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
IE | 22.09.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05270848 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001199733 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] , [0023]; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2004123439 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0024] - [0026]; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE102006024831 (HERAEUS TENEVO GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0035] , [0053] - [0054]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009090257 (HERAEUS QUARTZ UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 3; figures 6,7 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 2 ** page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 16 * | by applicant | DE4204406 | DE10041457 | DE102006024831 |