EP3284713 - BARREL WITH PRESSURE VALVE FOR BEER STORAGE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envases Oehringen GmbH Otto-Meister-Strasse 2 74613 Oehringen / DE | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Trivium Packaging Group Netherlands B.V. Zutphenseweg 51 7418 AH Deventer / NL | ||
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Ardagh MP Group Netherlands B.V. Zutphenseweg 51 7418 AH Deventer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORZ, Peter Liebshausener Str. 12 56291 Kisselbach / DE | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16190516.1 | 26.09.2016 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | EP20160185057 | 20.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16185057 | [2018/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284713 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B67D1/12, B65D83/66 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
B67D1/0406 (EP);
B65D83/663 (EP);
B67D1/0412 (EP);
B67D1/0437 (EP);
B67D1/1252 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASS MIT DRUCKVENTIL ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON BIER UND REGELVERFAHREN FUER DEN DRUCK IM FASS | [2018/08] | English: | BARREL WITH PRESSURE VALVE FOR BEER STORAGE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE THEREIN | [2018/08] | French: | FUT COMPRENANT UN CLAPET DE REFOULEMENT POUR LA CONSERVATION DE BIÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE LA PRESSION DANS LEDIT FUT | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 27.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2345081 (WARD LAWRENCE T) [X] 1-4,6,12 * page 1, column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * page 2, column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 13 * [I] 5,7-10; | [A]DE69900940T (HEINEKEN TECH SERVICES [NL]) [A] 1,16 * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 16 * * page 12, line 1 - line 34 *; | [X]WO2008060157 (HEINEKEN SUPPLY CHAIN BV [NL], et al) [X] 13,15* page 19, line 14 - page 21, line 12; figure 10A * | by applicant | WO9947451 |