EP3151162 - BIOMETRIC IMAGE CAPTURING APPARATUS AND BIOMETRIC IMAGE CAPTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/34] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi 211-8588 Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi 211-8588 Kanagawa / JP | ||
For all designated states Fujitsu Frontech Limited 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hama, Soichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Takahiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Iwaguchi, Isao c/o FUJITSU FRONTECH LIMITED 1776, Yanokuchi Inagi-shi, Tokyo 206-8555 / JP | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16190788.6 | 27.09.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | JP20150193434 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193434 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151162 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/147, G06V10/44, G06T7/13, G06V40/40, G06V40/12 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06V40/1382 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06T7/13 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (US);
G06V10/147 (EP,US);
G06V10/443 (EP,US);
G06V40/1394 (US);
G06V40/40 (EP,US);
G06V40/70 (US);
H04N23/56 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06K9/46, G06T7/13 | ||
Former IPC [2017/14] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG BIOMETRISCHER BILDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG BIOMETRISCHER BILDER | [2017/14] | English: | BIOMETRIC IMAGE CAPTURING APPARATUS AND BIOMETRIC IMAGE CAPTURING METHOD | [2017/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES BIOMÉTRIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES BIOMÉTRIQUES | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/17] | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005265585 (ROWE ROBERT K [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] ** figure 6 *; | [X]US2008025579 (SIDLAUSKAS DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] *; | [XI]US2011064282 (ABRAMOVICH GIL [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0070] * [I] 2-7,9-14; | [XI] - NIXON K A ET AL, "Multispectral fingerprint imaging for spoof detection", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE , ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (20050328), vol. 5779, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.606643, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 214 - 225, XP008098861 [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * lines 4-12; page 215 * * Section 3; page 216 - page 217 * * figure 3 * * Section 4.3; page 220 * [I] 4,7,11,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.606643 | by applicant | JPH0279181 | JP2010218259 |