EP3150044 - SEEDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landphair, Donald K. Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | 02 /
Frasier, Michael E. 816 Willow Street Iowa City, IA 52245 / US | 03 /
Liu, James Z. Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | 04 /
Walter, Jason D. 3920 Greenbrier Drive Bettendorf, IA 52722 / US | 05 /
Green, Lawrence D. 1615 Prairie Vista Drive Bettendorf, IA 52722 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16190940.3 | 27.09.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | US201514871476 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: US201514871476 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150044 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/20 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A01C7/205 (EP,US);
A01C5/062 (US);
A01C5/068 (US);
A01C7/203 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÄMASCHINE | [2017/14] | English: | SEEDING MACHINE | [2017/14] | French: | MACHINE D'ENSEMENCEMENT | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2014153157 (PREC PLANTING LLC [US]) [Y] 5,14 * figures 1-4C,10,25 * * sentences 1-6; paragraph [0033] * * first sentence; paragraph [0034] * * sentences 1-2; paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0040] *[A] 1-4,6,8-12,15; | [XAY]US2014303854 (ZIELKE ROGER R [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-12,15 * figures 1-4,7,8 * * sentences 1-2; paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 30] , [0053] , [0054] , [0062] * [A] 4,7,13 [Y] 5,14; | [XAYI]WO2015143433 (KINZE MFG INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,13,15 * figures 1-13; claims 11,12,14 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 2 * * page 12, lines 6-17 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 2 * * page 20, lines 6-27 * * page 21, line 13 - page 22, line 9 * [A] 3,6 [Y] 5,14 [I] 11,12 |